California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill July 23, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020
Bill March 4, 2020