Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4699.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2020 | Read first time. To print. |