Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 814.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|