Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2020 | Read first time. To print. |