California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB204 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2019

Amended

Bill June 28, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019