Assembly | 03/16/2020 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2020 | Read first time. To print. |