LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2044
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2044
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2044
Action History
Assembly
03/17/2020
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Assembly
03/16/2020
Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/12/2020
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 11).
Assembly
02/14/2020
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES.
Assembly
02/04/2020
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
Assembly
02/03/2020
Read first time. To print.