California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2019

Enrolled

Bill June 28, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2019

Amended

Bill May 23, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019