|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2718.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2134.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|