|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 4400.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 4702.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|