Assembly | 06/03/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2020 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2020 | Read first time. To print. |