Senate | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2019 | Read first time. To print. |