Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4710.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|