Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2019 | Read first time. To print. |