Assembly | 03/10/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2020 | Read first time. To print. |