Assembly | 08/17/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2020 | Read first time. To print. |