Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4725.) | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2020 | Read first time. To print. |