California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill March 4, 2020