California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2020

Amended

Bill August 4, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020