California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 12, 2020
Bill May 20, 2020
Bill May 11, 2020