Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4824.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Read first time. To print. |