09/11/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2020. | |||
09/11/2020 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/04/2020 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4374.). | ||
Senate | 08/11/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4723.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2020 | Read first time. To print. |