Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 4703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|