|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4376.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|