Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4676.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2020 | Read first time. To print. |