Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
Died on third reading file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|