|
09/26/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 10. Page 5361.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4434.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 4787.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|