|
09/30/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 5226.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4298.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4689.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|