Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4788.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|