|
09/29/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4400.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 6. Page 4760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|