|
09/09/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4379.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|