Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1923.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|