California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 20, 2020
Bill August 1, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020