Senate | 08/20/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2020 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4603.) | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2020 | Read first time. To print. |