|
09/30/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5426.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 5.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4856.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4747.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|