California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Amended

Bill August 5, 2020
Bill July 21, 2020
Bill May 7, 2020