Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3935.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|