Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.) | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2020 | Read first time. To print. |