|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 3013.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2460.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 5. Page 1625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|