California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2020

Amended

Bill August 20, 2020
Bill June 10, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020