|
09/27/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5427.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4679.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|