Senate
|
08/10/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 4695.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|