Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | Read first time. To print. |