Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4695.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2020 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | Read first time. To print. |