Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4728.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2020
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|