Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2019 | Read first time. To print. |