|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2943.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2285.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1860.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|