Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2020 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Read first time. To print. |