09/30/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2020. | |||
09/30/2020 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/04/2020 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.). | ||
Senate | 08/03/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4603.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2020 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Read first time. To print. |