|
08/31/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 16. Page 5451.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 4755.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|